RAY (REFUGEE ACTION YORK)

Charity number: 1154065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £79.71k £93.73k £81.36k £95.44k £113.39k
Total expenditure £50.70k £69.05k £96.36k £113.00k £104.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.76k £9.31k £5.50k £6.00k £8.30k