Accounts and annual returns BRAMWELL MEMORIAL PARISH INSTITUTE

Charity number: 504122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 October 2020 360 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required