MATHEMATICS RECOVERY COUNCIL UK AND IRELAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The MR Council promotes the mathematical education of people including children and adults who teach or support them. The main activities of the charity are training professionals in implementing the Maths Recovery Programme in their settings and local authorities, promoting research into children's mathematical thinking through conferences and professional development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £68,000 from 1 government contract(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Cayman Islands
- Germany
- Ireland
Governance
- 31 July 2014: CIO registration
- MATHS RECOVERY COUNCIL UK & IRELAND (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLOTTE LOUISE MADINE BA NPQH | Chair | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mary Rendle PGCE, MSc | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ashleigh Maw B.ED | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Stewart BSc,PGDE | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Alexandra Craik | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Roy William Grice | Trustee | 20 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE PORTER | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr RUTH ELIZABETH WILLEY MED DEDPSY | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE JANE STAUNTON-UNSWORTH BED | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.52k | £21.72k | £90.52k | £66.19k | £125.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.50k | £12.24k | £76.73k | £95.12k | £78.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £38.00k | £66.00k | £68.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 31 Jul 2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE MATHEMATICAL EDUCATION OF PEOPLE, INCLUDING CHILDREN AND THE ADULTS WHO TEACH OR SUPPORT THEM, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: A) PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING MATHEMATICS RECOVERY B) PROVIDING STAFF DEVELOPMENT THROUGH ACCREDITED MR CONSULTANTS C) PROVIDING QUALITY ASSURANCE FOR THE PROGRAMME D) PUBLISHING GUIDELINES AND CODES OF PRACTICE FOR THE PROGRAMME E) MAINTAINING A REGISTER OF ACCREDITED PERSONNEL F) CONSULTING WITH GOVERNMENT BODIES AND SCIENTIFIC ASSOCIATIONS G) SPONSORING CONFERENCES AT INTERNATIONAL, NATIONAL AND REGIONAL LEVELS H) PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO CHILDREN'S MATHEMATICAL THINKING I) MAKING KNOWLEDGE OF CHILDREN'S MATHEMATICAL THINKING AVAILABLE TO A WIDER AUDIENCE THROUGH PUBLICATIONS AND PRESENTATIONS J) SPONSORING SCHOLARSHIPS AND BURSARIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Swaledale Avenue
Rainhill
Prescot
L35 4NT
- Phone:
- 01514931458
- Email:
- mathsrecoveryuk20@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window