Accounts and annual returns WEST TYTHERLEY PTA

Charity number: 1154103
Charity reporting is overdue by 359 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 359 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 359 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required