BORDERS MISSION CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide public acts of worship & teaching through sermons, courses and groups Carry out pastoral work including visiting the sick & bereaved Promote Christianity through the staging of events & services Conduct religious assemblies in schools Promote the whole mission of the church & assist social cohesion through help with activities for older people, parents & toddlers & specific need groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

57 Trustee(s)
435 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 01 April 2014: Previously excepted registration
- BMC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
57 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Robert Hurley | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jill Moakes | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
June Leam | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Bakewell | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Simon Rose | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Herrington | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Lee | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julian Bonfield | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Lawrence | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Pauline Render | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Graham | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzzanne Knowles | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Howard Lawrence | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Render | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Leam | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Lindley Dawson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Bradley | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Bestwick | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Violet Geraldine Kirk | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Murray | Trustee | 23 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE PARR | Trustee | 23 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Michelle Chadwick | Trustee | 23 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carole Taylor | Trustee | 07 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joan Stokes | Trustee | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter David Taylor | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Heather Johnson | Trustee | 29 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Hopkinson | Trustee | 29 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Melvyn Leslie Mee | Trustee | 29 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Hopkinson | Trustee | 29 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Dellow | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sue Smith | Trustee | 16 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Linda Smith | Trustee | 17 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Brian Cupples | Trustee | 17 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Joanne Docherty | Trustee | 17 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christine Walden | Trustee | 11 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD IVAN SMITH | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CONNIE CANN | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANN ELIZABETH RANDLE | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN COUPE | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JILL MOAKES | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA JANE CHURNSIDE | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HOPKINSON | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PURSEGLOVE | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROL SIMPSON | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
KAREN GRICE | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROGER JACK CANN | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JILL CHRISTINE RENSHAW | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR EDWARD LEE | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE ANN SOUTHALL | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
George William Johnson | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Marie Wilson | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
WILF HOLMES | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD SMITH | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA MARGARET GRUNDY | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
HELEN JOY KIRK | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WHITEHEAD | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £253.52k | £253.53k | £370.39k | £618.97k | £403.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £346.33k | £326.94k | £392.53k | £262.89k | £352.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £165.96k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £453.01k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £262.89k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20/09/1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Central Methodist Church
High Street
Clay Cross
CHESTERFIELD
S45 9EE
- Phone:
- 01246866160
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window