Financial history CB HOUNSLOW SPORTS CLUB LTD

Charity number: 1154451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £19.88k £46.46k £42.87k £0 £0
Total expenditure £18.50k £47.22k £32.48k £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £26.71k N/A N/A