Trustees NAILSEA TITHE BARN TRUST

Charity Number: 1154686
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR Jo Edwards Chair 19 May 2015
None on record
Matthew Thomas Trustee 17 September 2019
None on record
John Laver Trustee 01 October 2017
None on record
Mark Andrew Thomas Trustee 19 May 2015
None on record
Christopher Pelmear Trustee 21 January 2014
None on record
BARBARA IRENE CALVERT Trustee 03 October 2013
None on record
DAVID FRANCIS Trustee 03 October 2013
None on record
SANDY RILEY Trustee 03 October 2013
None on record