RA TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RA TRUST IS A CHARITY WORKING TO SUPPORT WOMEN INVOLVED IN THE SEX INDUSTRY ACROSS LONDON. THESE WOMEN ARE VICTIMS OF SEXUAL EXPLOITATION, TRAFFICKING, PSYCHICAL AND EMOTIONAL ABUSE AND MODERN DAY SLAVERY. WE DO AN OUTREACH TO MEET WOMEN ON THE STREETS AND IN THE BROTHELS. WE PROVIDE THEM WITH LIFE CHANGING INFORMATION AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT. OUR MISSION IS TO HELP THEM ESCAPE FROM SEX TRADE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 November 2013: Standard registration
- 24 November 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.51k | £144.80k | £283.49k | £409.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.94k | £143.81k | £282.92k | £408.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 01 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | 01 June 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 AUG 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30/10/2013
Charitable objects
(1) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH FOR SEX WORKERS IN LONDON AND ACROSS THE UK; (2) TO RELIEVE AND PREVENT POVERTY FOR PERSONS INVOLVED IN PROSTITUTION IN THE UK; (3) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF INDIVIDUALS INVOLVED IN THE ILLEGAL SEX TRADE IN THE UK BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND HELPING THEM FIND ALTERNATIVE WORK WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window