Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TOLLESHUNT KNIGHTS WITH TIPTREE

Charity number: 1154944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £176.75k £120.33k £108.84k £160.38k £203.18k
Total expenditure £150.98k £182.54k £118.69k £138.81k £253.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £400 £400 £10.61k £34.88k £29.05k