FAIJURRAHMAN-MUHIUSSUNNAH ACADEMY

Charity number: 1157403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 27 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 06 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 06 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 06 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 06 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 23 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 23 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 11 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required