Financial history FAIJURRAHMAN-MUHIUSSUNNAH ACADEMY

Charity number: 1157403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £25.94k £28.98k £26.12k £25.16k £20.90k
Total expenditure £25.70k £27.69k £20.50k £24.73k £22.42k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A