Accounts and annual returns LONDON PARKS AND GREEN SPACES FORUM

Charity number: 1156063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window