Financial history LONDON PARKS AND GREEN SPACES FORUM

Charity number: 1156063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £102.54k £109.47k £150.13k £153.80k £186.91k
Total expenditure £107.84k £101.18k £111.12k £126.14k £134.86k
Income from government contracts £0 £3.73k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £9.00k £50.00k