Trustees LONDON PARKS AND GREEN SPACES FORUM

Charity number: 1156063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NIGEL JOHN THORNE Chair 09 March 2017
ARCHITECTS BENEVOLENT SOCIETY
Received: On time
Dr Ian Caleb MELL Trustee 01 July 2022
LANDSCAPE RESEARCH GROUP
Received: On time
Chloe Elizabeth Evans Kane Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Oliver Stephen Jones Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Ulrika Madeleine Hogberg Trustee 01 February 2021
THE SOCIETY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Natalie Beth Daniels Trustee 01 February 2021
STONEWALL HOUSING CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Dolapo Mariam Oladini Trustee 01 February 2021
None on record
Bernie Watson Trustee 12 June 2018
TOGETHER FOR SHORT LIVES
Received: On time
Kate Brown Trustee 14 September 2017
None on record
Craig Harris Trustee 01 July 2014
None on record
ANDREW GILL FCIHORT Trustee 01 July 2014
None on record