BOYES LANE RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 504147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £750 £1.00k £1.00k £1.00k £1.00k
Total expenditure £1.55k £1.10k £1.00k £1.00k £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A