WEST MALVERN FRIENDS OF MAJANI MAPANA

Charity number: 1155388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 03 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 31 July 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 17 March 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required