WEST MALVERN FRIENDS OF MAJANI MAPANA

Charity number: 1155388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £10.59k £11.72k £9.24k £13.04k £6.37k
Total expenditure £9.34k £11.52k £9.88k £10.18k £6.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A