Accounts and annual returns ST JOHN'S COMMON ROOM

Charity number: 1155621
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 February 2022 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 February 2022 93 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window