Trustees ST JOHN'S COMMON ROOM

Charity number: 1155621
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katherine Amy Hickson Chair 28 April 2021
None on record
Anna Robinson Trustee 06 September 2023
ST JOHN'S COMMON ROOM
Recently registered
ST JOHN'S COLLEGE, DURHAM
Received: On time
DURHAM STUDENTS' UNION
Received: On time
Benjamin Jonathan Dickinson Trustee 01 July 2023
ST JOHN'S COMMON ROOM
Recently registered
SEFTON NORTH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Libby Wright Trustee 01 July 2023
ST JOHN'S COMMON ROOM
Recently registered
Susannah Ruth Curtis Trustee 12 June 2023
ST JOHN'S COMMON ROOM
Recently registered
Emily Kathryn McDonald Trustee 18 March 2023
ST JOHN'S COMMON ROOM
Recently registered
Isabelle Louise Hubbert Trustee 17 October 2022
ST JOHN'S COMMON ROOM
Recently registered
Martin John Hodgetts Trustee 09 June 2020
None on record