TAROE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1156390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £62.44k £36.42k £14.14k £10.26k £90.73k
Total expenditure £41.12k £53.03k £26.17k £24.12k £21.58k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A