Financial history Global China Academy

Charity number: 1154640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £21.51k £45.42k £24.86k £32.56k £40.36k
Total expenditure £21.42k £42.49k £29.40k £9.91k £36.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A