Financial history TENDER NURSING CARE

Charity number: 1154186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £117.54k £160.38k £176.58k £159.25k £167.67k
Total expenditure £112.25k £130.12k £165.94k £168.09k £181.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £80.07k N/A N/A £98.01k
Income from government grants £80.33k £0 £92.20k £85.69k £16.34k