BRIDLINGTON AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity number: 504167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £3.78k £4.06k £4.17k £5.72k £4.48k
Total expenditure £4.66k £4.16k £4.14k £5.18k £3.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A