OJAALA WELFARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1154697
Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 33 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 33 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 12 July 2019 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 12 July 2019 12 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 03 July 2018 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 03 July 2018 3 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 31 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 20 October 2017 112 days late Download