OJAALA WELFARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1154697
Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £22.13k £26.49k £35.66k £30.16k £27.67k
Total expenditure £6.70k £12.87k £26.15k £34.72k £29.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A