MANCHESTER SENSORY LINKS

Charity number: 1154157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 October 2020 09 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 20 October 2019 10 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 20 October 2018 07 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 20 October 2017 14 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 20 October 2016 11 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 October 2016 Not Required