Financial history MANCHESTER SENSORY LINKS

Charity number: 1154157
Charity reporting is overdue by 186 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/10/2017 20/10/2018 20/10/2019 20/10/2020 20/10/2021
Total gross income £18.84k £6.20k £754 £1.90k £700
Total expenditure £7.81k £6.20k £1.14k £4.19k £200
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.97k N/A N/A N/A N/A