Trustees MANCHESTER SENSORY LINKS

Charity number: 1154157
Charity reporting is overdue by 195 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS G ANDERSON Chair 08 October 2013
None on record
Jean Tomlinson Trustee 09 September 2016
None on record
LUCIA MARTIN Trustee 03 September 2016
None on record
DR GILLIAN PAINTER Trustee 08 September 2015
None on record
Linda Hoburn Trustee 13 July 2015
None on record
Laura O'Grady Trustee 15 March 2014
None on record
JANET PIMBLETT Trustee 08 October 2013
None on record