MUSLIM TRUST AL-AALAMI

Charity number: 1157098
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 14 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 12 May 2021 12 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 09 February 2021 285 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 09 February 2021 285 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 10 September 2019 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 10 September 2019 133 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 30 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 30 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 30 April 2017 On time Download