THE DEBS PRICE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Debs Price Foundation was established in 2013 in memory of Debs Price, an inspirational lady who fought cancer for many years whilst helping disadvantaged people to help themselves. It supports action to relieve poverty and improve primary school literacy. The charity is now developing an innovative fintech product to assist those in poverty and its normal grant making is currently suspended
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 April 2014: Standard registration
- DPF (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Price | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN AIDAN JOSEPH PRICE | Trustee | 09 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £6.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 November 2022 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2022 | 376 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 November 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 APR 2013
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS, OR SERVICES, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE DISTRIBUTION OF, AND THE TRANSFER OF FUNDS TO, AN ELECTRONIC PRE-PAYMENT CARD OR CARDS FOR THE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE BENEFIT OF AND USAGE BY PERSONS WHO HAVE NO FIXED ABODE OR WHO ARE OTHERWISE IN HARDSHIP THROUGH POVERTY; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE PROMOTION OF INITIATIVES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THE LITERACY OF CHILDREN BETWEEN THE AGES OF FIVE AND ELEVEN YEARS; 3. ANY OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Warren Farm
Whittington
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL54 4EX
- Phone:
- 01451 860045
- Email:
- info@debsprice.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window