EXPLORE CHRISTIAN CHARITY

Charity Number: 1155546
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Explore Christian Charity has ceased to operate as a charity. Previously, its aim was to advance the Christian Religion in the UK by providing services and other charitable activities to the general public, with a specific focus on children and young people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 January 2014: CIO registration
  • 09 July 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 09 July 2024: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • EXPLORE CHURCH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £8.05k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £7.42k £155 £151 £2.57k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 June 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 July 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time