Financial history VELEHRAD LONDON

Charity number: 1154836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £47.92k £85.76k £89.04k £92.43k £85.22k
Total expenditure £62.89k £70.21k £89.98k £214.39k £100.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A