A DAY WITH MARY

Charity number: 1154888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 23 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 23 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 23 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 23 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 14 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 14 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 28 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 30 January 2017 On time Download