A DAY WITH MARY

Charity number: 1154888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £188.06k £218.80k £185.49k £213.38k £138.85k
Total expenditure £182.50k £221.55k £185.48k £226.81k £166.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A