ENGLISH SPRINGER SPANIEL WELFARE

Charity number: 1154632
Charity reporting is up to date (23 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 November 2020 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 November 2020 23 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 08 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 06 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 06 September 2016 On time Download