ENGLISH SPRINGER SPANIEL WELFARE

Charity number: 1154632
Charity reporting is up to date (23 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £67.76k £64.83k £79.72k £102.24k £68.19k
Total expenditure £68.56k £66.26k £77.53k £95.05k £92.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A