BISKRA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1155585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £145.33k £118.36k £122.03k £0 £0
Total expenditure £121.01k £191.66k £100.86k £121.55k £41.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A