GURU GOBIND SINGH GURDWARA

Charity number: 1156991
Charity reporting is overdue by 324 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £69.06k £39.18k £43.37k £44.10k £54.56k
Total expenditure £27.05k £41.72k £47.87k £43.37k £52.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A