BARROW-UPON-SOAR COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1156170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £66.59k £76.17k £88.79k £78.90k £48.25k
Total expenditure £60.33k £64.07k £104.91k £70.57k £45.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £16.46k £23.12k £11.44k £12.67k £28.60k