BARROW-UPON-SOAR COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1156170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Elizabeth Sadler Trustee 12 June 2019 None on record
BRIAN JOHN TETLEY Trustee 15 November 2013 None on record
Eluned Webb Trustee 16 May 2017 None on record
ANN HIGGINS Trustee 15 November 2013 None on record
VAL GILLINGS Trustee 15 November 2013 None on record
BETTY ELIZABETH TURNER Trustee 15 November 2013 None on record
Steven Crossley Trustee 12 June 2019 None on record
Craig O'Donnell Johnstone Trustee 02 June 2014 None on record
DAVID RODGERS Trustee 15 November 2013 None on record
Fiona McReynolds Trustee 14 January 2021 None on record
Judith Mary Rodgers Chair 15 November 2013 None on record
Diane Carol Byrnes Trustee 21 November 2018 None on record
Nic Noble Trustee 27 February 2018 None on record
FRANCES JACKLYN THOMPSON Trustee 15 November 2013 None on record
CERI FAIRBROTHER Trustee 15 November 2013 None on record
CHRIS BATES Trustee 15 November 2013 None on record