Financial history THE CRAFTIMATION FACTORY

Charity number: 1155890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £30.44k £18.02k £29.99k £33.93k £21.75k
Total expenditure £24.92k £28.16k £27.14k £27.74k £23.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £400 £1.10k N/A