TOWER HAMLETS MISSION

Charity number: 1154842
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 October 2017 On time Download