Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WALLASEY ST NICHOLAS WITH ALL SAINTS

Charity number: 1155232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £101.93k £120.99k £86.10k £104.18k £109.50k
Total expenditure £78.53k £87.76k £112.62k £98.10k £79.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A