Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WALLASEY ST NICHOLAS WITH ALL SAINTS

Charity number: 1155232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev JEFFREY JOSEPH STAPLES BA Chair 07 January 2014
None on record
Tracy Anne Lightfoot Trustee 16 September 2020
None on record
Elizabeth Brandwood Trustee 16 September 2020
None on record
Carolyne Ann Hankey Trustee 16 September 2020
None on record
Julia Frances Sayle Trustee 16 September 2020
None on record
Carol Anne Grey Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Patricia Dodd Trustee 29 April 2018
None on record
Mr Ray Piercy Trustee 04 April 2016
None on record
Mary Vanessa Gaskell Trustee 19 April 2015
None on record
Julie Dawn Piercy Trustee 19 April 2015
None on record
Barbara Hazel Smith Trustee 19 April 2015
None on record
JOYCE MILLICENT BOGGILD SRN SCM Trustee 19 April 2015
None on record
MISS JILL GOODWIN Trustee 07 January 2014
None on record
Colin Hazlehurst Trustee 07 January 2014
None on record
MR DAVE HUDSON Trustee 07 January 2014
None on record
MRS GILL HAZLEHURST Trustee 07 January 2014
None on record
LOUISE ANN JONES Trustee 07 January 2014
None on record