THE PAT NEWMAN MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1155183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 15 June 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 21 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 25 September 2019 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 12 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 29 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required