Financial history BIRKENHEAD COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1156333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £172.89k £155.69k £161.23k £256.03k £143.98k
Total expenditure £196.47k £188.11k £159.82k £263.80k £128.37k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £63.99k