EAST MANCHESTER COMMUNITY BOAT PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist in the provision of facilities, in the interests of social welfare, for recreation, education or other leisure time, occupation of persons who have need of such facilities by reason of their disability. In the event of spare capacity to include persons who are disadvantaged by social and economic circumstances with the object of improving and enhancing their conditions of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

10 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Manchester City
- Tameside
Governance
- 28 February 2014: CIO registration
- 27 October 2014: Funds received from 1052320 EAST MANCHESTER COMMUNITY BOAT PROJECT
- EMCBP (Working name)
- THE EAST MANCHESTER COMMUNITY BOAT PROJECT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JOHN WILLIAM STEPHENS | Chair | 20 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Angela Cartledge | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Frederick Fletcher | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN SHARPLES | Trustee | 21 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Gwendolyn Ann Walker | Trustee | 21 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Lesley Bailey | Trustee | 21 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
KEITH GLOVER | Trustee | 16 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUE STEVENTON | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL ANDERSON | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAMES STRUDWICK | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.07k | £23.69k | £18.66k | £5.88k | £10.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.17k | £16.39k | £18.17k | £11.62k | £14.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 20 January 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 20 January 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 25 September 2018 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 25 September 2018 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 28 FEB 2014 AMENDED ON 21 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES,IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE,FOR RECREATION,EDUCATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME, OCCUPATION OF PERSONS MAINLY IN THE EAST OF MANCHESTER AND GREATER MANCHESTER AREAS,WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR DISABILITY.IN THE EVENT OF SPARE CAPACITY TO ALSO INCLUDE PERSONS WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED BY SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING AND ENHANCING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Contact information
- Address:
-
144 Sheffield Road
Hyde
SK14 2PJ
- Phone:
- 01613665186
- Email:
- emcbp@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window