Financial history St. Mark Universal Care

Charity number: 1155451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £950.17k £400.16k £233.25k £142.61k £171.48k
Total expenditure £593.60k £426.69k £273.92k £214.77k £193.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £42.63k £13.19k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £908.33k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £39.96k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £1.88k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £593.60k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £8.75k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A