LIONS MMA (BRADFORD)

Charity Number: 1154647
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

1.to promote community participation in healthy recreation by providing or assisting in the provision of facilities 2.To further other charitable purposes for the public benefit as are exclusively charitable according to the laws of england and wales as the trustees may from time to time determine.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2019

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £454

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 November 2013: CIO registration
  • 23 December 2020: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 23 December 2020: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019
Total gross income £812 £590 £1.08k £294 £0
Total expenditure £295 £767 £1.00k £294 £454
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2019 06 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 06 April 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2018 07 January 2020 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 07 January 2020 129 days late
Annual return 31 October 2017 11 March 2019 192 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 March 2019 192 days late