Trustees VER-COLNE VALLEY UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1156215
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Gettleson | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Maris | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Brandrith | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Rees | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Yates | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Scott | Trustee | 18 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Nigel Pragnell | Trustee | 09 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Davies | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Photi | Trustee | 20 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.